THE POLISH INSTITUTE AND SIKORSKI MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To collect, preserve and interpret through the material evidence of Poland's past, especially that connected with the activities of the Polish Government-in-Exileand it's Armed Forces 1939-45, for the public benefit, education and enjoyment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Wojcik | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
LUDOMIR LASOCKI | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danuta Bildziuk | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Gabriel | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Korwin-Szymanowski | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Nowakowski | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wojciech Nosalik | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.57k | £359.72k | £513.93k | £376.74k | £582.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £471.79k | £385.41k | £427.17k | £467.31k | £665.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £175.38k | N/A | £54.41k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £93.19k | N/A | £53.36k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £245.36k | N/A | £292.00k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £170.76k | N/A | £30.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £376.01k | N/A | £618.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £51.16k | N/A | £46.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £14.86k | N/A | £18.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £24.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £123.49k | N/A | £3.84m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £9.21m | N/A | £4.98m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £439.54k | N/A | £415.70k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £33.54k | N/A | £30.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 December 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
29 December 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27TH MAY 1965, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7TH JULY 1966 AND 7TH MAY 2005.
Charitable objects
(1) TO SERVE AS A NATIONAL, INTELLECTUAL AND CULTURAL CENTRE OF THE POLISH COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (2) TO MAINTAIN INTELLECTUAL CO-OPERATION AND CULTURAL INTERCOURSE BETWEEN THE POLISH AND BRITISH. (3) TO COLLECT DOCUMENTATION PERTAINING TO THE PARTICIPATION OF POLAND IN THE SECOND WORLD WAR WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE LEADERSHIP OF GENERAL SIKORSKI. (FOR FULL DETAILS, SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OR ASSOCIATION.) 4) TO COLLECT THE COLOURS AND RELICS OF THE POLISH ARMED FORCES AND THE POLISH HOME ARMY AND PRESERVE ANY OTHER OBJECTS RELATING TO THE STRUGGLE OF THE POLISH NATION FOR INDEPENDENCE. 5) TO PURSUE AND ENCOURAGE HISTORICAL RESEARCH AND TO PUBLISH HISTORICAL REVIEWS AND DOCUMENTS CONNECTED WITH THAT STRUGGLE. 6) TO PROCURE FOR POLES FACILITIES TO ACQUIRE KNOWLEDGE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND THE BRITISH COMMONWEALTH. 7) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN LIBRARIES ADAPTED TO THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 8) TO HELP POLES IN QUESTIONS OF BOTH SCHOOL AND UNIVERSITY EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 31 October 1994 : Standard registration
- 10 November 2015 : Removed
- 10 November 2015 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office
20 PRINCE'S GATE
LONDON
SW7 1PT
- Phone:
- 02075899249
- Email:
- info@pism.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window