ENFIELD CHURCH TRUST FOR GIRLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To give financial aid to young women residing in the Ancient parish of Enfield for educational and charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Enfield
Governance
- 27 May 1963: Standard registration
- CHURCH SCHOOL OF INDUSTRY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Jane Garrett | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Lindsey Cameron | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Katherine Mary Allen Ladd | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Simon Edwards | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Ruth Catherine Mackay | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Emma Kate Oppong-Addai | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Dr Steve Griffiths | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.13k | £1.33k | £124 | £1.82k | £2.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 January 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2021 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 12TH APRIL 1976
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) AND THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN RESIDENT, ATTENDING SCHOOLS OR OTHER PLACES OF EDUCATION OR WORKING IN THE FORMER BOROUGH OF ENFIELD AS CONSTITUTED IMMEDIATELY BEFORE THE 1ST APRIL 1965.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Silver Street
Enfield
EN1 3EG
- Phone:
- 07905861234
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window