THE WELSTEAD CHARITABLE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Welstead charitable fund provides resources, awards and grants for entertainment to young people connected with South Croydon United church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Croydon
Governance
- 26 September 1961: Standard registration
- 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225 | £195 | £166 | £168 | £168 | |
|
Total expenditure | £30 | £30 | £30 | £40 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 01 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 04 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21.11.1924 AND SCHEME OF 16.02.1961
Charitable objects
A 1/2 INCOME TO BE USE FOR ENTERTAINING THE CHILDRED ATTENDING THE SOUTH CROYDEN METHODIST SUNDAY SCHOOL AND B THE OTHER HALF TO BE USE FOR THE PROVISION OF PRIZES FOR PROFICIENCY IN RELIGIOUS KNOWLEDGE TO BE DISTRIBUTED AT CHRISTMAS TIME TO THE CHILDRED ATTENDING SOUTH CROYDEN METHODIST SUNDAY SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
SOUTH CROYDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window