Accounts and annual returns THOMAS PRATT'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312258
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 25 March 2011 26 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 25 March 2010 04 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 25 March 2009 26 January 2011 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2009 Not Required