THE CITY AND DIOCESE OF LONDON VOLUNTARY SCHOOLS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to voluntary aided church of england schools for repairs and to individuals under the age of 25 attending voluntary aided schools in the Diocese for 2 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 October 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SCHOOLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £299.86k | £279.91k | £112.25k | £125.84k | £214.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.55k | £333.66k | £149.50k | £145.63k | £1.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 4TH JUNE 1957 AND SCHEME OF 28TH APRIL 1976
Charitable objects
(1). MAINTENANCE OF SCHOOL PREMISES IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA, BEING CHURCH OF ENGLAND AIDED OR SPECIAL AGREEMENT SCHOOL. (2) THE RESIDUE OF THE NET INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- A. THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, 'UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING, APPROVED BY THE GOVERNORS B. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, A UNIVERSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING C. THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION; D. FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO STUDY MUSIC OF OTHER ARTS; E) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 CAUSTON STREET
LONDON
SW1P 4AU
- Phone:
- 02038375152
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window