THE UPHILL AND WATERS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Barking And Dagenham
- Redbridge
Governance
- 23 October 1968: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 23 OCTOBER 1968 AND 15 OCTOBER 1980
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM AND THAT PART OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE WHICH WAS FORMERLY IN THE BOROUGH OF DAGENHAM.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window