THE ROYAL SCHOOL HAMPSTEAD TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE OR WERE DEPENDENTS OF SERVING OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES, INCLUDING BY: A) AWARDING OF SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS B) PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING MUSIC OR ARTS), ENABLING TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION, OR PREPARATION FOR ANY OCCUPATION OR PROFESSION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 November 1964: Standard registration
- 26 April 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 26 April 2017: Funds transferred to 1167682 ARMED FORCES EDUCATION TRUST
- ROYAL SCHOOL HAMPSTEAD (Previous name)
- THE ROYAL SCHOOL HAMPSTEAD (THE ROYAL SOLDIERS' DAUGHTERS' SCHOOL 1855) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/09/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.15m | £195.88k | £230.84k | £302.29k | £330.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.63m | £34.80k | £30.20k | £59.33k | £296.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.04m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £94.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.59m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £45.70k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 27 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 27 June 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 22 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 30 June 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 13 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 13 June 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 21/05/1862 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/1987 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29/02/1988 AS AMENDED ON 11/12/1991 AS AMENDED ON 09/06/1999 AS AMENDED ON 30/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/08/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE OR WERE DEPENDENTS OF SERVING OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: A) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; B)PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window