ST MARY NEWINGTON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants for educational purposes to the 4 named schools, other schools and individuals attending such schools or resident in the Ancient Parish of St Mary Newington
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Southwark
Governance
- 18 April 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Mervyn Wingfield | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
REVD MICHAEL GRAEME RAWSON | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Timothy James McNally | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Amir Eden | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Robert Ashdown | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Alexander Leiffheidt | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Robin Lovell | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Janet Goodland | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Peter MacFarlane | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Neha Jain | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Janet Simpson | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.50k | £15.47k | £11.75k | £16.95k | £10.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.04k | £20.00k | £6.92k | £14.35k | £14.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14 DEC 1955, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 DEC 1965 AND RESOLUTION DATED 26 SEP 2010.
Charitable objects
(1) TO ASSIST IN THE PURCHASE OF A NEW SITE OR THE ERECTION ALTERATION OR IMPROVEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF BUILDINGS OF CERTAIN CHURCH SCHOOLS IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA. (2) TO BENEFIT CHILDREN RESIDENT IN, OR IN ATTENDANCE AT SCHOOLS IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA, WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, BY THE AWARD OF EXHIBITIONS FOR THEIR FURTHER EDUCATION OR ASSISTANCE IN PREPARATION FOR ENTRY INTO A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING; AND OTHERWISE PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING.
Area of benefit
THE ANCIENT PARISH OF ST. MARY NEWINGTON SOUTHWARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marshall's House
66 Newcomen Street
London
SE1 1YT
- Phone:
- 020 7407 2967
- Email:
- clerk@newcomencollett.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window