BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Educational Foundation

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,100
Total expenditure: £1,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BACON'S SCHOOL UNITED ENDOWMENT (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHERYL PAYNE Trustee 16 March 2023
FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S SCHOOL
Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
Ven SIMON GATES Trustee 14 December 2022
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
IRENE WOLSTENHOLME Trustee 01 January 2022
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
MILES WINTER Trustee 01 January 2022
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
ALBERTA ROSENIOR Trustee 01 January 2022
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
Rev TOMOS REED Trustee 01 January 2022
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
RIGHT REV DR ROSEMARIE MALLETT Trustee 13 November 2020
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
MARIA MCBEAN Trustee 13 November 2020
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
HELEN DIXON Trustee 13 November 2020
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
JULIA CORBY Trustee 01 January 2020
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
ELIZABETH BROAD Trustee 01 March 2019
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
Rev ANDREW JOHN WILLIAMS Trustee 01 January 2017
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
EKUNDAYO OLOMU Trustee 01 January 2017
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
Rev ARIANDNE ROLANDA VEN DEN HOF Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
Dr CATHARINA STIBE-HICKSON Trustee 03 April 2014
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
Rev PAMELA ANN KURK Trustee 03 April 2014
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
HINTON BEQUEST FUND
Received: On time
CHURCH HALL, WHYTELEAFE (LITERARY INSTITUTE)
Received: On time
The Rt Revd Christopher Thomas James Chessun Trustee 31 October 2012
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
THE BISHOP OF SOUTHWARK'S LENT FUND
Received: 4 days late
THE NIKAEAN ECUMENICAL TRUST
Received: On time
SOCIETY OF SAINT FRANCIS CENTRAL FUND
Received: On time
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
Rev ERICA MIELLE WOOFF Trustee 31 October 2012
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
FRIEND'S OF ST MICHAEL
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
MARTIN BRECKNELL Trustee
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
RAINBOW FUND FOR SOUTH AFRICA
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE LIVING WORD TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, RICHMOND WITH ST MATTHIAS AND ST JOHN THE DIVINE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.00k £567 £69 £2.74k £6.10k
Total expenditure £2.27k £1.00k £2.00k £1.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Southwark Diosesan Board of Educati
48 Union Street
LONDON
SE1 1TD
Phone:
02072349200
Website:

No information available