KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational Trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED POLL DATED 5TH NOVEMBER 1860 SCHEME DATED 30TH JULY 1907 AND STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK(EDUCATIONAL ENDOWMENT) ORDER NO. 13,1974.
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS, OR CHILDREN ONLY OF THE LABOURING, MANUFACTURING AND OTHER POORER CLASSES.
Area of benefit
LAMBETH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southwark Diosesan Board of Educati
48 Union Street
LONDON
SE1 1TD
- Phone:
- 02072349200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window