STOKE ST GREGORY RECREATION AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity Number: 1079873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Management and maintenance of village playing field

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £26,147
Total expenditure: £16,746

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 March 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STOKE ST GREGORY PLAYING FIELD MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER HOUSE Trustee 22 April 2024
WILLIAMS MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
Angela Kiddle Trustee 22 April 2024
THE FRIENDS OF STOKE ST GREGORY PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
Hollie Hembrow Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Anne Merritt Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Danny James Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Stuart Mark Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Tom Duxbury Trustee 20 March 2018
None on record
Trevor Alan Daniels Trustee 20 March 2018
None on record
Graham Gleed Trustee 19 May 2015
WILLIAMS MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
Athena Dare Trustee 19 May 2015
None on record
PAUL MORSE Trustee
None on record
MRS KATHY DAVIDSON KATHY DAVIDSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £11.80k £7.38k £11.80k £14.95k £26.15k
Total expenditure £8.06k £15.29k £8.06k £16.81k £16.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.21k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 17 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 17 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 10 April 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 02 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 24 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 02 November 2021 308 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Manse
Stoke St. Gregory
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA3 6JG
Phone:
01823490069
Website:

No information available