THE CLERKENWELL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of Poverty/Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Islington
Governance
- 21 January 1977: Standard registration
- 05 March 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE CLERKENWELL CHARITIES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £400 | £400 | £0 | £803 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 21 JANUARY 1977
Charitable objects
THE YEARLY INCOME TO BE PAID TO THE MANAGERS OF THE CLERKENWELL PAROCHIAL CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TO ASSIST THEM IN DISCHARGING THEIR OBLIGATION UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1973 WITH RESPECT TO THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SAID SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window