Financial history HIGHGATE ST MICHAEL'S NATIONAL SCHOOL

Charity number: 312451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £124.91k £134.54k £118.35k £179.20k £161.96k
Total expenditure £107.26k £147.97k £190.19k £131.11k £162.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A