Accounts and annual returns THE CHARVILLE FUND ICW CHARVILLE COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 312462
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2007 13 June 2008 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 16 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 16 April 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 27 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 05 June 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 30 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 30 November 2004 On Time