THE GREEN STREET GREEN COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL AND HOME ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to assist in the advancement of the education of the pupis of the school by engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advancement of the pupils, and developing effective relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 25 September 1969: Standard registration
- GSGS & HA (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liz Walter | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Salter | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Alexander | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerri McKechan-Moore | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Wilkin | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ayako Dunstan | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Cook | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Bedziejewski | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Griggs | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yasemin Cornish | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Dilley | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Ellis | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alix Anderson | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.86k | £5.81k | £25.35k | £31.27k | £24.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.58k | £20.74k | £9.52k | £22.74k | £18.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 April 2025 | 306 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 02 April 2025 | 306 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 21 MARCH 1969 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/09/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
GREEN STREET GREEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends of GSG: Green Street Green Primary School
Vine Road
ORPINGTON
Kent
BR6 6DT
- Phone:
- 07967304839
- Email:
- friendsofgsgschool@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window