THE ANTONIA CLARK SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 18 November 1965: Standard registration
- 06 April 1992: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 06 April 1992: Funds transferred to 312425 The Portal Trust
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 9TH DECEMBER 1909 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 19TH FEBRUARY 1928 AND 30TH APRIL 1957.
Charitable objects
AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE TO ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARING PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING. AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS OF MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES FOR TRAVEL ABROAD FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES. PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING. PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS IN THE ADMIISTRATIVE COUNTY OF LONDON , WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF HAMPSTEAD.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.