THROCKMORTON TROTMAN'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 09 February 1965: Standard registration
- 21 October 2003: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 21 October 2003: Funds transferred to 275067-8 THE THROCKMORTON TROTMAN EDUCATIONAL FUND
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 28/03/1912, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 07/11/1979
Charitable objects
(A) MAINTENANCE OF EXHIBITIONS, TO BE CALLED THROCKMORTON TROTMAN EXHIBITIONS,FOR BOYS AND & GIRLS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN GREATER LONDON, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO CANDIDATE RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF ST. GILES CRIPPLEGATE AND ST. LUKE OLD STREET (AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 28 MARCH 1912). FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME OF 07/11/1979.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.