ISLEWORTH BLUE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of the Isleworth Church of England Blue School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hounslow
Governance
- 06 February 1963: Standard registration
- ISLEWORTH BLUE SCHOOLS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID FREEMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dave Cokayne | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Leong | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Sayer | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Reichardt | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
FIONA STRONGMAN | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE JOY PIELICHATY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.96k | £114.14k | £144.95k | £149.63k | £167.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.46k | £86.72k | £35.46k | £87.85k | £89.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2022 | 387 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 4TH MARCH 1955 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 13TH MAY 1969, 8TH NOVEMBER 1983 AND 16TH SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED ON 25 APR 2016
Charitable objects
A VOLUNTARY SCHOOL WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1953, WHEREIN RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION SHALL BE GIVEN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THE SUPPORT THEREOF. AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES FOR FURTHER EDUCATION FOR PUPILS OF ISLEWORTH GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR BOYS OR THE ISLEWORTH GREEN SCHOOL FOR GIRLS, OR ISLEWORTH BLUE C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL, IF SUCH PUPILS ARE RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA, PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING.IF AND IN SO FAR AS INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION IN MANNNER AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY THE SAME FOR THE BENEFIT OF ISLEWORTH GREEN SCHOOL
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF ISLEWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Church Street
Old Isleworth
Middlesex
TW7 6BE
- Phone:
- 07940794083
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window