Trustees THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF FRANCIS COURTNEY

Charity number: 312547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Service Trustee 30 October 2024
HOUSING PATHWAYS TRUST
Received: On time
KING GEORGE V MEMORIAL HOUSES
Received: On time
Tye McMahon Trustee 30 October 2024
KING GEORGE V MEMORIAL HOUSES
Received: On time
HOUSING PATHWAYS TRUST
Received: On time
Sarah Woodbridge Trustee 30 October 2024
KING GEORGE V MEMORIAL HOUSES
Received: On time
HOUSING PATHWAYS TRUST
Received: On time
Alison Pegg Trustee 09 February 2024
HOUSING PATHWAYS
Received: On time
KING GEORGE V MEMORIAL HOUSES
Received: On time
HOUSING PATHWAYS TRUST
Received: On time
NORTHFIELDS COMMUNITY LIBRARY
Received: On time
Fiona Howie Trustee 13 July 2023
HOUSING PATHWAYS TRUST
Received: On time
HOUSING PATHWAYS
Received: On time
KING GEORGE V MEMORIAL HOUSES
Received: On time
Joshua John Bramwell Reddaway Trustee 27 October 2022
HOUSING PATHWAYS TRUST
Received: On time
HOUSING PATHWAYS
Received: On time
KING GEORGE V MEMORIAL HOUSES
Received: On time
Andrea Joseph Trustee 17 September 2020
HOUSING PATHWAYS
Received: On time
HOUSING PATHWAYS TRUST
Received: On time
KING GEORGE V MEMORIAL HOUSES
Received: On time
Mark Melluish Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record