DONHEAD FIELD CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity used to own a field centre for the benefit of scholars and students of the Henrietta Barnett School. This was sold in November 2020 and the proceeds of sale will be used to create new outdoor learning facilities closer to the school in North West London. Final determination as to how these funds are invested will be made by the Donhead Field Centre Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnet
Governance
- 29 September 1971: Standard registration
- HENRIETTA BARNETT SCHOOL FIELD CENTRE FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Cosmetatos | Chair | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pragya Mehta | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Coffman | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Rodwell | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire Gelband | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 March 2022 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 SEPTEMBER 1971 AMENDED BY SCHEME 15 DECEMBER 1993 AND AMENDED 1 JULY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE HENRIETTA BARNETT SCHOOL IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, FACILITIES, AND SERVICES WHICH THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL ARE UNABLE TO PROVIDE; AND (B) AWARDING BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS AND OTHER KINDS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PUPILS ATTENDING THE SCHOOL WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HENRIETTA BARNETT SCHOOL
CENTRAL SQUARE
LONDON
NW11 7BN
- Phone:
- 020 8458 8999
- Email:
- office@hbschool.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window