THE WILLIAM F STANLEY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing resources for education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Croydon
Governance
- THE WILLIAM F STANLEY FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE STANLEY TECHNICAL TRADE SCHOOL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Reza Majid | Chair | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS SHAW | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERNADETTE LODERICK | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Cowden | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNY ROACH-HAMILTON | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT S ARNDTZ | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ULRIKE FOUNTAIN | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £766 | £758 | £783 | £789 | £795 | |
|
Total expenditure | £142 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
A SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 4TH APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF LAND, BUILDINGS AND OTHER FACILITIES NECESSARY FOR AND INCIDENTAL TO THE OPERATION OF A SCHOOL, AN ACADEMY OR ANY OTHER TYPE OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITY AS MAY BE ESTABLISHED, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PROMOTION OF LIFE LONG LEARNING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Linked charities
- 22 July 1963 : Standard registration
- 06 November 2013 : Removed
- 06 November 2013 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Charlton Close
Charlton Kings
CHELTENHAM
GL53 8DH
- Phone:
- 07854 160123
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window