Accounts and annual returns GREEN SCHOOL, ISLEWORTH

Charity number: 312650
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2014 31 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 14 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 31 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 13 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required