Financial history GREEN SCHOOL, ISLEWORTH

Charity number: 312650
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/08/2014
Total gross income £59 £37 £50 £58 £53
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A