Financial history THE SARAH BONNELL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £71.67k £61.57k £68.00k £70.17k £74.79k
Total expenditure £173.27k £24.11k £28.97k £38.34k £70.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A