Trustees KINGS HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST (RICHMOND) LIMITED
Charity number: 312669

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Snowden-Brown | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Machado | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Drinkall | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Cunningham | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sumangala Sornalingam | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Scott | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Gale | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Thomas Pollitt | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jayne Peacock | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Mark Edwards | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann George | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Churchill Ward | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Hendry | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Julian Davison | Trustee | 02 August 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.