Financial history ADDEY AND STANHOPE SCHOOL

Charity number: 312693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £63.93k £20.97k £23.99k £54.68k £25.29k
Total expenditure £151.12k £102.98k £106.59k £113.49k £123.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £54.78k £12.17k £15.05k £44.97k £15.18k