ARCHBISHOP TENISON'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Managing and disbursing income from an endowment to support education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £22,794
Total expenditure: £422,116

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 March 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ARCHBISHOP TENISON'S UNITED SCHOOLS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Swanson Chair 21 February 2023
None on record
Antony Phillips Trustee 25 March 2025
THE TOWER HOUSE SCHOOL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr Sundiatu Dixon-Fyle Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
Stephen Adams Trustee 16 May 2023
None on record
Nailaa Iqbal Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Clive Jourdain Trustee 07 February 2018
None on record
Simon Tenison Trustee 01 February 2018
None on record
John Walter Trustee 22 November 2017
None on record
David Mortimer Trustee 07 January 2014
THE ASSOCIATION OF GRACE BAPTIST CHURCHES (SOUTH EAST)
Received: On time
GRACE BAPTIST CHARITIES LIMITED
Received: On time
CHESHAM STUDENTS' AND APPRENTICES FUND
Received: On time
PRIORS CHARITY
Received: On time
Adrian Brown Trustee 07 January 2014
MALAWI ASSOCIATION FOR CHRISTIAN SUPPORT CIO
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.23k £25.02k £26.87k £28.33k £22.79k
Total expenditure £101.23k £48.24k £49.03k £45.25k £422.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 FEBRUARY 1980
Charitable objects
TO ENDOW ANNUAL PRIZES TO BE KNOWN AS THE TAKI BAIG MEMORIAL PRIZES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 14 March 1968 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
4 Pilgrims Way East
Otford
SEVENOAKS
Kent
TN14 5QN
Phone:
07841193775
Website:

No information available