ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY'S AIMS ARE TO PROVIDE A DAY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS SO THE CHARITY MAKES GRANTS TO ST. MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS HIGH SCHOOL OR TO INDIVIDUALS WITHIN THAT SCHOOL AS PART OF THOSE AIMS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lambeth
Governance
- 30 April 1964: Standard registration
- FOUNDATION ACCOUNT AND DEVELOPMENT FUND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael George Currie | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Henshaw | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Natasha Walker | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHARLENE MARTYN | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Canon Dr SAMUEL WELLS | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|||||
HAROLD REID | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.24k | £11.41k | £11.35k | £11.27k | £9.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £539 | £643 | £433 | £433 | £533 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 695 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 695 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 July 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24TH MARCH 1873 AS AMENDED AND ALTERED BY SCHEMES DATED 20TH NOVEMBER 1894, 28TH JUNE 1911 AND 20TH JANUARY 1922
Charitable objects
A DAY SCHOOL FOR GIRLS.
Area of benefit
LAMBETH
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS
HIGH SCHOOL
155 TULSE HILL
LONDON
SW2 3UP
- Phone:
- 02086839680
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window