Trustees ST MARGARET'S SCHOOL (HAMPSTEAD) LTD
Charity number: 312720

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Brettle | Chair | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alistair Tresidder | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lydia McBride | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Atkinson | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tina Marton | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marie Clare Mendham | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FELDMAN | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dugald MacNeill | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
FAARID PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ADRIAN WAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHELLE WAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.