BLANDFORD EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As in Area of Operation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 21 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUTH DISBROW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Antony Patrick Frowd | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Tamplin | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Margaret Reynolds | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
BROOK GRANT MACCALLUM | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Saunders | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carole Cornelia Gill | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Duffin | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Philip Martin Watson | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CLARK | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JEROME DODGE | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.80k | £148.16k | £140.77k | £136.82k | £139.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.21k | £145.24k | £155.88k | £138.60k | £146.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/04/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/08/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 NOV 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BLANDFORD FORUM, DORSET, AND ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY 1. THE FORMATION OF A TRUE FELLOWSHIP OF BORN AGAIN MEN AND WOMEN WHO DESIRE ABOVE ALL ELSE TO LIVE SANCTIFIED AND SPIRIT FILLED LIVES; AND 2. THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A SPIRITUAL MINISTRY BASED IN BLANDFORD FORUM WHICH EXALTS THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND SEEKS THE SALVATION AND THE EDIFICATION OF ALL.
Area of benefit
BLANDFORD FORUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUNNYDALE
ALBERT STREET
BLANDFORD FORUM
DT11 7HZ
- Phone:
- 01258 450689
- Email:
- admin@becbygrace.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window