SARUM HALL SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£3,441,177
Donations and legacies | £7.28k | |
Charitable activities | £3.31m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £105.08k | |
Other | £19.57k |
Total expenditure:
£3,251,638
Raising funds | £9.40k | |
Charitable activities | £3.24m | |
Other | £0 |
£22,573 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £31,428 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £9.40k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.24m | |
Retained for future use | £189.54k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £9.40k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.24m | |
Retained for future use | £212.11k |
People

38 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Camden
Governance
- 12 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Allyson Greene McEver | Chair | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Marcella Christiana McLean | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Amy Frances Quittenton | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Stuart Robert Davies | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Ian Kenneth Lazarus | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
David Christopher Day | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Frances Hack | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Elizabeth Ann McKendrick | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||
PROFESSOR GORDON JOHN SAMPSON RUSTIN | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Jonathan Paul French Smith | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Vivian Thomas | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.84m | £2.85m | £2.97m | £3.24m | £3.44m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.62m | £2.72m | £2.75m | £3.11m | £3.25m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.21k | £36.97k | £41.15k | £44.07k | £31.43k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £2.05k | £0 | £18.09k | £7.28k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.82m | £2.77m | £2.94m | £3.19m | £3.31m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £25.91k | £27.25k | £20.27k | £21.32k | £105.08k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £52.58k | £5.82k | £16.10k | £19.57k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.61m | £2.72m | £2.74m | £3.11m | £3.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.39k | £7.53k | £3.80k | £4.00k | £9.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £70.15k | £100.43k | £88.86k | £116.81k | £105.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £4.39k | £7.53k | £3.80k | £4.00k | £9.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.43m | £5.38m | £5.39m | £5.39m | £5.58m | |
|
Long-term investments | £861.62k | £808.30k | £903.82k | £908.40k | £440.27k | |
|
Other assets | £2.09m | £2.30m | £2.57m | £2.89m | £3.72m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.41m | £1.46m | £1.51m | £1.71m | £2.04m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 18 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JULY 1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 OCT 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 APR 2013 as amended on 26 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND EXTEND EDUCATION (INCLUDING INTELLECTUAL, SPIRITUAL, MORAL SOCIAL CULTURAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND THROUGH ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING OR OTHERWISE SUPPORTING A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS AND IN PARTICULAR SARUM HALL SCHOOL TO THE INTENT THAT EDUCATION INCLUDES BUT IS NOT LIMITED TO THE PURSUIT OF A FORMAL CURRICULUM AND EXTRA CURRICULA ACTIVITIES FOR PUPILS, ADULT EDUCATION COURSES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES CALCULATED TO ENHANCE OR DEVELOP A RANGE OF LIFE SKILLS FOR PUPILS OR MEMBERS OF THE WIDER COMMUNITY AND TO PERMIT THE USE OF THE SCHOOLS' FACILITIES BY THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SARUM HALL SCHOOL
15 ETON AVENUE
LONDON
NW3 3EL
- Phone:
- 02077942261
- Email:
- office@sarumhallschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window