PHYLLIS WALLBANK EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Phyllis Wallbank Educational Trust provides properties for education and educational research. It also makes grants to individuals. Full details of the aims and objectives of the charity are published on the charity's website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Camden
- Hackney
Governance
- 03 November 1964: Standard registration
- PHYLLIS WALLBANK EDUCATIONAL TRUST - ICW THE GATEHOUSE MONTESSORI SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev EUGENE CURRAN CM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Katie Wallbank | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Wallbank | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lyon Duncan | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
BENEDICT NEWELL WALLBANK RIBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BROTHER DUNSTAN ROBIDOUX OSB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK WALLBANK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.76k | £115.93k | £122.06k | £119.59k | £116.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.09k | £26.25k | £41.69k | £82.98k | £91.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 OCTOBER 1964
Charitable objects
(A) THE ACQUISITION OF THE GATEHOUSE SCHOOL, DALLINGTON STREET, E.C.1. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AT THE SAID SCHOOL AS A DAY-SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND GIRLS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
158 AGAR GROVE
LONDON
NW1 9TY
- Phone:
- 07906070178
- Email:
- mwallbank@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window