BLACKHEATH PREP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide academic excellence for pupils aged 3 to 11, whilst allowing pupils to benefit from our extra-curricular programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Greenwich
Governance
- 22 November 1966: Standard registration
- BLACKHEATH NURSERY AND PREPARATORY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- BLACKHEATH PREPARATORY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- CHRIST'S COLLEGE (BLACKHEATH) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW NEDEN | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen Born | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Pratt | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNE EDWARDS | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.88m | £4.96m | £5.63m | £6.36m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.71m | £5.67m | £5.96m | £6.23m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £185.91k | £80.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.98k | £7.92k | £554 | £3.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.13k | £11.36k | £30.27k | £39.88k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.66m | £4.84m | £5.59m | £6.22m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £19.09k | £10.63k | £6.41k | £95.36k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £185.91k | £94.23k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.64m | £5.67m | £5.96m | £6.23m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £11.36k | £20.84k | £34.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £73.23k | £8.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 September 2022 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 September 2022 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/10/1960 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/10/2012 as amended on 28 Jun 2021 as amended on 13 Oct 2022 as amended on 16 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLACKHEATH PREP
4 ST. GERMANS PLACE
BLACKHEATH
LONDON
SE3 0NJ
- Phone:
- 02088580692
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window