Accounts and annual returns ALLERGY INDUCED AUTISM
Charity number: 1063472
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2007 | 28 April 2008 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2007 | 04 February 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2006 | 17 April 2007 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2006 | 25 January 2008 | 300 days late | |
Annual return | 31 May 2005 | 12 April 2006 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2005 | 06 March 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2004 | 31 March 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2004 | 12 May 2006 | 407 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window