ALLERGY INDUCED AUTISM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charities objectives are to relieve sufferers of autism in particular by carrying out research research into autism and associated conditions and disseminating the useful results of research and other relevant information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 July 1997: Standard registration
- 27 April 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- AIA (Working name)
- ALLERGY INDUCED AUTISM (Working name)
- ALLERGY INDUCED AUTISM NETWORK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2004 | 31/05/2005 | 31/05/2006 | 31/05/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.65k | £39.09k | £2.74k | £969 | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.61k | £42.73k | £16.75k | £36.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2007 | 28 April 2008 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2007 | 04 February 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2006 | 17 April 2007 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2006 | 25 January 2008 | 300 days late | |
Annual return | 31 May 2005 | 12 April 2006 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2005 | 06 March 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2004 | 31 March 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2004 | 12 May 2006 | 407 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED 5 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED 18TH OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SUFFERERS OF AUTISM IN PARTICULAR CARRYING OUT RESEARCH INTO AUTISM AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND OTHER RELEVANT INFORMATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window