Accounts and annual returns JAMES ALLEN'S GIRLS' SCHOOL
Charity number: 312750
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 09 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 09 February 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 29 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 29 February 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 23 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 23 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 23 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 23 March 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | 25 May 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | 25 May 2005 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window