Governing document ST CLEMENT DANES SCHOOL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 31ST MARCH 1964 AND ORDER OF 18TH DECEMBER 1979,ORDER SEALED 24TH APRIL 1991, ORDER SEALED 23RD AUGUST 1993 AND SCHEME DATED 29TH MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
(1) TO HOLD AND MAINTAIN THE PROPERTY COMPRISING ST CLEMENT DANES SCHOOL, AND SUBJECT THERETO, TO ASSIST THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL IN MEETING SUCH EXPENSES OF MAINTAINING THE SCHOOL AS ARE REQUIRED BY LAW TO BE MET BY ITS GOVERNORS AND IN PROVIDING AT THE TRUSTEE'S DISCRETION SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR THE SCHOOL WHICH ARE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS; (2) TO MANAGE SUCH CHARITABLE FUNDS ON BEHALF OF THE GOVERNORS AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE GOVERNORS SHALL DECIDE; (3) TO ADMINISTER THE ST CLEMENT DANES DISCRETIONARY FUND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.