CAMDEN SCHOOL FOUNDATION OF FRANCES MARY BUSS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance and development of the school buildings to enhance the educational environment and experience of pupils at the school, a Voluntary Aided 1010 pupil comprehensive school with a co-educational sixth form.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £397,943 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Camden
Governance
- 09 June 1983: Standard registration
- 18 December 1996: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEKHA KLOUDA | Chair |
|
||||||
Jane Hindle | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|||||
BOB HOUSE | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Donat | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Atmore | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Pope | Trustee | 17 November 2011 |
|
|||||
ANGELA MARGARET MASON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £290.53k | £238.50k | £198.39k | £394.79k | £554.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £348.13k | £364.08k | £321.73k | £361.83k | £495.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £189.97k | £173.21k | £122.10k | £224.71k | £397.94k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £140.79k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.17k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £494.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £693 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.69m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £83.42k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £408.34k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 31/08/1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09/01/2012
Charitable objects
1) THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT OF A DAY AND, IF THOUGHT FIT, A BOARDING SCHOOL FOR GIRLS IN OR NEAR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARROW; AND 2) THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT OF A DAY SCHOOL IN OR NEAR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- AGNES HACKNEY MEMORIAL PRIZE
- ALICE LUPTON PRIZE
- BETTY HANEMANN MEMORIAL PRIZE
- BUSS MEMORIAL PRIZE
- BUSS MEMORIAL PRIZE
- CLARA AND EDITH COLLET MEMORIAL PRIZES
- DAME KITTY ANDERSON TRUST FUND
- DR ANDERSON CENTENARY PRIZE
- ELEANOR LYNDON PRIZE
- ELIZABETH HOSKYN LECTURE FUND
- ELMA HEDGES BEQUEST
- ELSIE HELENA TODD MEMORIAL
- ELSIE HELENA TODD MEMORIAL
- EMMA GUGGENHEIM PRIZE
- ENID HOGGAN MEMORIAL PRIZE
- F M BUSS MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND TRUST
- FANNY GREEN MEMORIAL FUND
- FLORENCE GIBBONS MEMORIAL FUND
- FLORENCE STANGER BURSARY
- FRANCES MARY BUSS MUSIC PRIZE
- FRANCES MARY BUSS MUSIC PRIZE
- GABRIELLE D'HONDT FOUNDATION
- HARKER 5TH FORM PRIZE
- HARKER SCIENCE PRIZE
- HEINS ULRICH RACHMANN MEMORIAL PRIZE
- HEINZ ULRICH LACHMANN PRIZE
- HESTER ARMSTEAD PRIZE
- JANE AGNES CHESSAR PRIZE FUND
- JOAN BRACKENBURY PRIZES
- JOAN TAYLOR RIDLEY
- JOHN BACK PRIZE FUND
- JOHN CORBY AWARD
- K N H HARKER SCHOLARSHIP
- LESLEY PAULINE LEADER MEMORIAL PRIZE
- LUCY WELCH PRIZE FUND
- M E GOSSIP HISTORY PRIZE
- MACLEAN-FRAZER MEMORIAL
- MARIAN ELFORD PRIZES
- MARJORIE MUIR PRIZE
- MARJORIE MURI PRIZE
- MARY SYBIL SMITH BEQUEST
- MENSBIER SCHOLARSHIP
- MISS L E WALTER PRIZE
- MRS CRANE'S SCHOLARSHIP
- NACHSCHEN PRIZE
- PATRICIA ERSKINE MEMORIAL PRIZE
- PHILIPPA THRELFALL DRAWING SCHOOL PRIZE
- PRANCE MATRICULATION EXHIBITION
- SEBBA PRIZE FUND
- SEPTIMUS BUSS MEMORIAL PRIZE
- SOPHIE BRYANT EXHIBITION FUND
- THE 1965 PRIZE FUND
- THE HATFIELD FUND
- WALTON GEOGRAPHY PRIZE
- WEBB'S PRIZE (NATIONAL HEALTH SOCIETY'S PRIZE)
- 09 June 1983 : Standard registration
- 18 December 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAMDEN SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
SANDALL ROAD
LONDON
NW5 2DB
- Phone:
- 02074853414
- Email:
- finance@csg.school
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window