Linked charities THE UNIVERSITY OF GREENWICH
Charity number: 312783
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH JANUARY 1895 AS AFFECTED BY SCHEMES DATED 9TH AUGUST 1901, 15TH MARCH 1912, 13TH JULY 1962, 15TH SEPTEMBER 1966 AND 26TH AUGUST 1970
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH, CARRY ON AND CONDUCT A POLYTECHNIC. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE THE SCHEDULE TO THE SCHEME OF 26TH AUGUST 1970.)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 24 September 1991 : Standard registration
- 20 February 1995 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.