THE LEE EDUCATION CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE

Charity number: 312801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Making grants for the purpose of promoting the education of persons resident in the London Borough of Lewisham who are, in the opinion of the Governors, in need of financial assistance. Making grants to Lewisham-based educational establishments (and organisations promoting education) if the grant will be for the benefit of those in need of financial help.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £72,444
Total expenditure: £138,894

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Lewisham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 December 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LEE (EDUCATIONAL) CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE (Working name)
  • WILLIAM HATCLIFFE (EDUCATIONAL) CHARITY LEE (Working name)
  • WILLIAM HATCLIFFE'S EXHIBITION FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER CHRISTOPHER THOMAS Chair
THE LEE CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE
Received: On time
THE HELEN WILLIAMS LEE CHARITY
Received: On time
BOONES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rev Manuela Marianne Schmucki Trustee 16 October 2024
THE LEE CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE
Received: On time
JOHN PASSMAN TATE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET OF ANTIOCH, LEE
Received: 15 days late
ST MARGARET'S HOUSE CHARITY, LEE
Received: On time
Anirudhya Neeladri Dakshy Trustee 24 January 2024
THE LEE CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE
Received: On time
ESTATE CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE
Received: On time
DOREEN BROOKER Trustee 30 March 2022
None on record
Richard Clough Trustee 14 September 2021
BOONES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ESTATE CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE
Received: On time
THE LEE CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE
Received: On time
Winifred Doris Kirkman Trustee 12 January 2012
THE HELEN WILLIAMS LEE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE LEE CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE
Received: On time
KATHRYN CHARLOTTE DONNELLY Trustee
THE LEE CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE
Received: On time
BOONES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £51.05k £53.11k £82.00k £50.00k £72.44k
Total expenditure £5.57k £5.43k £17.79k £101.00k £138.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 July 2021 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 July 2021 180 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Margaret's Visitors Centre
2 Brandram Road
Lewisham
London
SE13 5EA
Phone:
07525456746
Website:

No information available