THE FORREST AND GRINSELL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
mAKES EDUCATIONAL AWARDS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 11 December 1969: Standard registration
- 16 November 2009: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 16 November 2009: Funds transferred to 226936 WESTMINSTER ALMSHOUSES FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.43k | £41.02k | £41.73k | £38.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.47k | £43.73k | £61.45k | £56.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 13 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 01 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 17 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 20 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 26 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 29 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 25 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 25 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 8 NOVEMBER 1957 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 8 MARCH 1972 AND 29 APRIL 1991
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS NOT EXCEEDING 25 YEARS IN AGE, RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THOSE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER UNITED PARISHES OF ST. MARGARET AND ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, IN ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, TRAINING COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION, APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES, TO BE AWARDED UNDER RULES TO BE MADE BY THE TRUSTEES, INCLUDING RULES AS TO THE VALUE AND PERIOD OF TENURE OF THE EXHIBITIONS, AND THE QUALIFICATIONS, AND METHOD OF ASCERTAINMENT AND SELECTION, OF CANDIDATES; (B) FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT, TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING; (C) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS; AND (D) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
CITY OF WESTMINSTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window