ROYAL ACADEMY OF DANCE

Charity number: 312826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Royal Academy of Dance is a registration organisation for dance teachers, a Higher Education provider for aspiring dance teachers, an Awarding Organisation leading to proficiency in dance at a high level; and the owner of Benesh Movement Notation; and through these provides dance training, dance teacher education, and dance assessment services to students and teachers. :

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Aruba
  • Australia
  • Barbados
  • Belgium
  • Bermuda
  • Brazil
  • Brunei
  • Canada
  • Chile
  • China
  • Costa Rica
  • Cyprus
  • Denmark
  • El Salvador
  • Finland
  • France
  • Germany
  • Greece
  • Guatemala
  • Guernsey
  • Honduras
  • Hong Kong
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Ireland
  • Isle Of Man
  • Israel
  • Italy
  • Jamaica
  • Japan
  • Jersey
  • Jordan
  • Kuwait
  • Laos
  • Luxembourg
  • Macau
  • Malaysia
  • Malta
  • Mexico
  • Netherlands
  • New Zealand
  • Northern Ireland
  • Norway
  • Peru
  • Philippines
  • Portugal
  • Scotland
  • Serbia
  • Singapore
  • South Africa
  • South Korea
  • Spain
  • Sri Lanka
  • St Lucia
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • Taiwan
  • Thailand
  • The Bahamas
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Turkey
  • United Arab Emirates
  • United States
  • Venezuela
  • Vietnam

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 February 1963: Standard registration
  • 23 March 1994: Removed
  • 09 September 2011: Funds received from
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RAD (Working name)
  • ROYAL ACADEMY OF DANCING (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Moss CBE Chair 18 April 2023
READING ROOM AND VILLAGE INSTITUTE
Received: On time
THE STEPHEN AND JOY MOSS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
WEST LONDON SYNAGOGUE ENDOWMENT FUND TRUST
Received: On time
THE FEDERATION OF LONDON YOUTH CLUBS
Received: On time
THE JOSEPH LEVY ENDOWMENT TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Sarah Georgina Robbins Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Jane Karczewski Trustee 21 April 2024
THE CIRCLE OF WOMEN
Received: On time
Catherine Ward Quinn Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Deborah Cornelius Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Stephen Sacks Trustee 11 May 2022
None on record
Victoria Allport Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Chi Cao Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Amy Giancarlo Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Esther Chesterman Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
James Cane Trustee 11 May 2021
WILD AT HEART FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rachel Jackson-Weingartner Trustee 11 May 2021
None on record
Prof Peter Flew Trustee 25 April 2019
AFRICAN PASTORS' FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
IMOGEN KNIGHT Trustee 27 April 2017
COLOURS OF DANCE RADIATES
Received: 303 days late
IDA LEVINE Trustee 28 April 2016
DANCERS' CAREER DEVELOPMENT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £23.93m £16.95m £18.70m £20.63m £22.00m
Total expenditure £23.92m £19.94m £16.86m £20.28m £22.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £530.00k £628.84k £37.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £48.00k £382.00k £1.64m £1.74m £920.00k
Income - Other trading activities £1.34m £1.17m £1.11m £1.02m £1.15m
Income - Charitable activities £22.22m £14.22m £14.62m £17.16m £19.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £32.00k £28.00k £11.00k £23.00k £51.00k
Income - Other £295.00k £1.15m £1.32m £686.00k £224.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £22.23m £17.95m £15.22m £18.35m £20.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.34m £1.46m £1.25m £1.45m £1.55m
Expenditure - Governance £401.00k £511.00k £1.64m £518.00k £529.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £351.00k £527.00k £391.00k £481.00k £501.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £14.00m £19.58m £19.70m £27.52m £26.37m
Long-term investments £50.00k £55.00k £150.00k £165.00k £159.00k
Other assets £11.12m £9.83m £12.74m £12.56m £10.63m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £7.33m £8.59m £9.16m £10.56m £8.06m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 05 June 2023 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 20 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 17 DECEMBER 1979.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY ESTABLISHING COURSES AND CLASSES TO ENSURE THE MAINTENANCE AND CONTINUING IMPROVEMENT OF OF STANDARDS OVER A WIDENING FIELD IN THE ART AND PRACTICE OF CHOREOGRAPHY AND TO ENCOURAGE CREATIVE THEATRICAL WORK RELATED TO CLASSICAL BALLET. (B) TO ESTABLISH, EQUIP, FURNISH AND MAINTAIN A SMALL THEATRE OR STUDIO FOR THE PROMOTION AND TRAINING OF CHOREOGRAPHERS AND FOR THE PERFORMANCE OF DANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 13 February 1963 : Standard registration
  • 23 March 1994 : Removed
  • 09 September 2011 : Asset transfer in

Contact information

Address:
Royal Academy Of Dance
188 York Road
LONDON
SW11 3JZ
Phone:
02073268000