Governing document THE BRITISH SCHOOL OF OSTEOPATHY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/06/2011
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE GENERAL ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PROFESSIONAL AND OTHERWISE; TO ORGANISE AND DELIVER QUALITY COURSES OF INSTRUCTION, CLINICAL DEMONSTRATION AND RESEARCH; AND TO PREPARE AND QUALIFY THOSE WHO WISH TO MAINTAIN AND PRACTISE THE SYSTEM OF OSTEOPATHY. (B) TO ENCOURAGE AND IF NECESSARY PROVIDE MEANS OF DISSEMINATING INFORMATION REGARDING OSTEOPATHY AMONT THE OSTEOPATHIC PROFESSION AND PROMOTE THE ADVANTAGES OF THE PROFESSION TO THE PUBLIC. (C) TO PROVIDE THE FACILITIES FOR THE DISCOVERY, FORMULATION AND TEACHING OF THE SYSTEM OF OSTEOPATHY AS A SYSTEM, SCIENCE, OR METHOD OF TREATMENT TO SYSTEMATISE AND PLACE ON A SCIENTIFIC BASIS THE SAID SYSTEM, AND TO IMPART INSTRUCTION IN THE SAME TO THE PROFESSION AND TO THE PUBLIC. (D) TO PROVIDE EXCELLENT, AFFORDABLE AND ACCESSIBLE OSTEOPATHIC HEALTHCARE TO OUR COMMUNITIES, SO PROMOTING THE BENEFITS OF OSTEOPATHY AND IMPROVING CLINICAL SERVICES AND ENHANCING THOSE COMMUNITIES HEALTH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.