Financial history CAMBRIDGE TUTORS EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 312878
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £3.91m £3.00m £2.36m £2.72m £1.62m
Total expenditure £5.34m £4.34m £3.33m £3.10m £2.62m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £314.43k £102.15k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.37k £1.19k £0 £314.43k £102.15k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.91m £3.00m £2.36m £2.40m £1.51m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.41k £302 £675 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.34m £4.34m £3.33m £3.10m £2.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £66.19k £353.13k £108.00k £93.52k £122.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0