Governing document CAMBRIDGE TUTORS EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 19TH MARCH 1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 7TH JUNE 1973 AND 22ND FEBRUARY 1983, 20TH FEBRUARY 1990, 25 FEBRUARY 2003 AND 24 FEBRUARY 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO CONDUCT, CARRY ON, ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD ANY BOARDING OR DAY COLLEGES FOR THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS OF EITHER SEX OR BOTH SEXES, AND TO SUPPLY TO THE STUDENTS GENERAL INSTRUCTION OF THE HIGHEST CLASS, TOGETHER WITH PHYSICAL, MORAL AND RELIGIOUS TRAINING, BUT SO THAT EACH SUCH COLLEGE SHALL BE CARRIED ON AS AN EDUCATIONAL CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.