ELMHURST TRUST FUND ICW QUEEN MARY COLLEGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hardship fund and general financial assistance for students and student activities at Queen Mary and Westfield College, Mile End Road, London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 21 December 1966: Standard registration
- 06 December 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48 | £47 | £1.60k | £213 | £34 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 05 March 2013 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 23 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 23 February 2011 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH SEPTEMBER, 1966
Charitable objects
A TRUST FOR SUCH GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MEN'S HALL OF RESIDENCE OF QUEEN MARY COLLEGE KNOWN AS "ELMHURST", HIGH ROAD, WOODFORD IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL COUNTY OF ESSEX OR FOR THE BEEFIT OF STUDENTS RESIDENT AT SUCH HALL OF RESIDENCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT:- (A) TO ASSIST STUDENTS OF QUEEN MARY COLLEGE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE COLLEGE") WHO ARE IN RESIDENCE AT ELMHURST AFORESAID (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE 'ALL") ON EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS FOR WHICH PUBLIC FUNDS ARE NOT NORMALLY AVAILABLE. (B) TO ASSIST IN THE GENERAL EDUCATIONAL FUNCTIONS OF THE HALL. (C) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE FOR STUDENTS WHO FIND DIFFICULTY IN PAYING THEIR FEES. (D) TO PROVIDE TRAVEL SCHOLARSHIPS (E) TO PROVIDE APPARATUS (WHETHER EDUCATIONAL OR RECREATIONAL) AT THE HALL.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window