BCNO LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BCOM provides graduate and postgraduate osteopathic education via an integrated mix of academic and clinical study.The College offers university validated degree courses which are also, where appropriate, professionally accredited by the General Osteopathic Council and the General Council & Register of Naturopaths.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£3,903,997
Donations and legacies | £2.72k | |
Charitable activities | £3.85m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.67k | |
Other | £48.07k |
Total expenditure:
£4,630,296
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.63m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.63m |
People

55 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Camden
- Kent
- Belgium
- Denmark
- Finland
- France
- Italy
- Spain
Governance
- 26 May 1964: Standard registration
- BRITISH COLLEGE OF NATUROPATHY AND OSTEOPATHY (Working name)
- BRITISH COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE (Working name)
- BRITISH COLLEGE OF NATUROPATHY AND OSTEOPATHY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Tasker | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip David Bright | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
EMILY ELSA EVES | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIO COELHO LUIS | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Fielding OBE DO | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Naomi Cairistiona Parasram | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nicholas Paul William Goddard | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM KENNETH JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Conor Philip McDermott | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Devan Rajendran | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Hayes | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simeon Milton | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD KIDD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60m | £1.26m | £1.44m | £4.29m | £3.90m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70m | £1.49m | £1.52m | £4.58m | £4.63m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.00k | £8.00k | £9.22k | £140 | £2.72k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.54m | £1.21m | £1.39m | £4.25m | £3.85m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.87k | £1.35k | £457 | £277 | £3.67k | |
|
Income - Other | £45.94k | £39.90k | £41.86k | £47.66k | £48.07k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.70m | £1.49m | £1.52m | £4.58m | £4.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £600 | £600 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £32.12k | £29.94k | £107.62k | £109.14k | £173.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £600 | £600 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £600 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.91m | £2.76m | £5.61m | £9.00m | £6.55m | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.02m | £3.09m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £322.51k | £125.63k | £298.60k | £971.85k | £4.92m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.01m | £963.60k | £1.03m | £1.84m | £625.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 1ST MARCH 1956 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1957, 14 FEBRUARY 1997, 18 AUGUST 2005 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2008 as amended on 30 Nov 2021 as amended on 09 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
1.1 The objects of the Company are for the public benefit to: 1.1.1 promote the health and well-being of the general public by advancing the practice of osteopathy, naturopathy and other evidence informed therapeutic methods; 1.1.2 advance and promote education and research in the field of osteopathy, naturopathy and other evidence informed therapeutic methods by: (1) designing and delivering high quality under-graduate level education in the fields of osteopathy and naturopathy; (2) designing and delivering post-graduate courses for osteopaths, allied and other healthcare professionals; and (3) designing, conducting and publishing scientific peer-reviewed research in these areas
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Frazer House
6 Netherhall Gardens
Hampstead
London
NW3 5RR
- Phone:
- 02074356464
- Email:
- info@bcom.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window