Governing document THE HAMPSTEAD GARDEN SUBURB INSTITUTE
Charity number: 312951
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 APRIL 1918 AS AMENDED 1 JULY 1966, 9 JUNE 1993, 18 NOVEMBER 1993 AND 25 NOVEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING AND EDUCATION IN THE HAMPSTEAD GARDEN SUBURB AREA AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
HAMPSTEAD GARDEN SUBURB AND ELSEWHERE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.