THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)

Charity Number: 313001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Primary function is to develop Church of England Education. Services are provided in the form of 1: Advice and Guidance to Teachers, Governors, Trustees and Chaplains. 2: Training and Development for School Staff and Governors 3: Project Manangement and support for the development of School Buildings and Facilities and 4: Support for the provision and development of Education Chaplaincy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SDBE (Working name)
  • SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Poyton Trustee 06 July 2023
None on record
CHERYL PAYNE Trustee 16 March 2023
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S SCHOOL
Charity reporting is overdue by 330 days
Prof Peter Flew Trustee 01 February 2023
AFRICAN PASTORS' FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
ROYAL ACADEMY OF DANCE
Received: On time
Ven SIMON GATES Trustee 14 December 2022
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
IRENE WOLSTENHOLME Trustee 01 January 2022
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
MILES WINTER Trustee 01 January 2022
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
ALBERTA ROSENIOR Trustee 01 January 2022
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
Rev TOMOS REED Trustee 01 January 2022
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
MARIA MCBEAN Trustee 13 November 2020
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
RIGHT REV DR ROSEMARIE MALLETT Trustee 13 November 2020
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
HELEN DIXON Trustee 13 November 2020
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
ELIZABETH BROAD Trustee 01 March 2019
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
EKUNDAYO OLOMU Trustee 01 January 2017
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
Rev ARIADNE ROLANDA VAN DEN HOF Trustee 01 January 2017
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
Dr CATHARINA STIBE-HICKSON Trustee 03 April 2014
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
Rev PAMELA ANN KURK Trustee 03 April 2014
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
HINTON BEQUEST FUND
Received: On time
CHURCH HALL, WHYTELEAFE (LITERARY INSTITUTE)
Received: On time
The Rt Revd Christopher Thomas James Chessun Trustee 13 August 2013
THE BISHOP OF SOUTHWARK'S LENT FUND
Received: 4 days late
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE NIKAEAN ECUMENICAL TRUST
Received: On time
SOCIETY OF SAINT FRANCIS CENTRAL FUND
Received: On time
Rev ERICA MIELLE WOOFF Trustee 13 August 2013
FRIEND'S OF ST MICHAEL
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
MARTIN BRECKNELL Trustee
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
RAINBOW FUND FOR SOUTH AFRICA
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE LIVING WORD TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, RICHMOND WITH ST MATTHIAS AND ST JOHN THE DIVINE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.77m £17.28m £9.23m £8.88m £8.07m
Total expenditure £2.45m £6.44m £10.90m £4.79m £8.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.30m £5.58m £5.14m
Income - Donations and legacies £754.90k £15.16m £7.26m £6.64m £5.53m
Income - Other trading activities £591.67k £547.40k £554.79k £566.33k £522.18k
Income - Charitable activities £642.75k £620.65k £605.47k £670.26k £763.13k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £785.44k £951.64k £817.09k £1.00m £1.26m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.25m £6.10m £10.39m £4.36m £7.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £192.35k £345.94k £511.35k £431.13k £437.75k
Expenditure - Governance £57.89k £46.47k £55.28k £62.43k £62.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £4.10m £7.67m £0 £1.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £27.17k £22.33k £24.48k £34.68k £22.09k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £1.93m £1.77m £1.43m £1.39m £1.06m
Long-term investments £19.46m £28.71m £22.20m £21.72m £21.93m
Other assets £670.55k £6.51m £1.68m £4.25m £5.53m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.60m £5.47m £3.50m £2.27m £3.26m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Southwark Diocesan Board Of Edn
48 Union Street
LONDON
LONDON
SE1 1TD
Phone:
02072349200