Trustees The Leathercraft Trust
Charity number: 313056

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Barrow | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Associate Professor Gillian Proctor | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wheelband | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Graham Stuart Lampard | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hasse Angus Marrum | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Nicholas Tusting | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|||||
MR BILL AMBERG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN PEBODY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE DARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.